THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:23:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ESTONIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 100
637 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 898-7924
Fax: (905) 853-8677
Address: suite 410-325 Milner Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1B 5N1
Phone: 416-284-4744
Fax: 416-284-0141

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 03 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Talvi Hess Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hess (CPSO#: 84517 )
Business Address: Suite 100
637 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2R2
(905) 898-7924

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ESTONIAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 100
637 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 898-7924
Fax: (905) 853-8677
Address: suite 410-325 Milner Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1B 5N1
Phone: 416-284-4744
Fax: 416-284-0141

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 03 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Talvi Hess Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hess (CPSO#: 84517 )
Business Address: Suite 100
637 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2R2
(905) 898-7924

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TALVI HESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HESS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TALVI HESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HESS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006