THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:24:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Supportive Care
620 University Avenue, 12th floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Extension: 4270
Fax: (416) 946-2866

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.C. Mak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mak (CPSO#: 84519 )
Business Address: UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Palliative Care
Room 16-757
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-4501 Extn: 4270

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Supportive Care
620 University Avenue, 12th floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Extension: 4270
Fax: (416) 946-2866

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.C. Mak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mak (CPSO#: 84519 )
Business Address: UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Palliative Care
Room 16-757
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-4501 Extn: 4270

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHUI CHUNG ERNIE MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHUI CHUNG ERNIE MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006