THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:20:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 304 - 191 McNaughton Rd E
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 840-3755
Fax: (416) 840-3753
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey So Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chan (CPSO#: 84353 ) Dr. J. So (CPSO#: 84521 )
Business Address: 304-191 McNaughton Rd E
Maple ON L6A 4E2
(416) 840-3755
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Business Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 304 - 191 McNaughton Rd E
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 840-3755
Fax: (416) 840-3753
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey So Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chan (CPSO#: 84353 ) Dr. J. So (CPSO#: 84521 )
Business Address: 304-191 McNaughton Rd E
Maple ON L6A 4E2
(416) 840-3755
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Business Address: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY SHULIN SO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY SHULIN SO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006