THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:58:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 209-1005 Elgin St W
Cobourg ON K9A 5J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053734366
Fax: 9053730687

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 06 Oct 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alison Tilley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tilley (CPSO#: 84523 )
Business Address: 209-1005 Elgin St W
Cobourg ON K9A 5J4

Corporation Name: Alison Tilley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Nov 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 209-1005 Elgin St W
Cobourg ON K9A 5J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053734366
Fax: 9053730687

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 06 Oct 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alison Tilley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tilley (CPSO#: 84523 )
Business Address: 209-1005 Elgin St W
Cobourg ON K9A 5J4

Corporation Name: Alison Tilley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Nov 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALISON ELLEN TILLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TILLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALISON ELLEN TILLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TILLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Oct 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006