THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:13:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Suite 112
379 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 554-0094
Fax: (905) 554-0076

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Yogeswaran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Yogeswaran (CPSO#: 84524 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
112 - 379 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
(905) 554-0094
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Suite 112
379 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 554-0094
Fax: (905) 554-0076

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Yogeswaran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Yogeswaran (CPSO#: 84524 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
112 - 379 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
(905) 554-0094
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KUMARESAN YOGESWARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOGESWARAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KUMARESAN YOGESWARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOGESWARAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006