THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:36:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Walkers & New Medical Associates
495 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7N 2E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 634-9292
Fax: (905) 681-7274

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Ramsaywak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ramsaywak (CPSO#: 84531 )
Business Address: Walkers & New Medical Associates
495 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7N 2E3
(905) 634-9292

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Walkers & New Medical Associates
495 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7N 2E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 634-9292
Fax: (905) 681-7274

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Ramsaywak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ramsaywak (CPSO#: 84531 )
Business Address: Walkers & New Medical Associates
495 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7N 2E3
(905) 634-9292

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PEGGY CLARE RAMSAYWAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMSAYWAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PEGGY CLARE RAMSAYWAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMSAYWAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006