THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:59:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
Suite 101
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 853-6644
Fax: (905) 853-1898

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Olubimpe Ayeni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Sep 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Ayeni (CPSO#: 84534 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
581 Davis Drive
Suite 101
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
(905) 853-6644

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
Suite 101
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 853-6644
Fax: (905) 853-1898

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Olubimpe Ayeni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Sep 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Ayeni (CPSO#: 84534 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
581 Davis Drive
Suite 101
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P6
(905) 853-6644

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLUBIMPE AYENI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AYENI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLUBIMPE AYENI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AYENI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006