THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 06:48:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Strathroy Middlesex General Hosp
Department of Emergency Medicine
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 245-1550
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Alexandra Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
29 Noxon St
Ingersoll Ontario N5C 3V6
Phone: 519-485-1700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Four Counties Health Services
Department of Emergency Medicine
1824 Concession Dr
Newbury Ontario N0L 1Z0
Phone: 519-693-4441
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David L. Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lam (CPSO#: 84536 )
Business Address: 1824 Concession Drive
Newbury Ontario N0L 1Z0
(519) 693-4441
Business Address: 29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll Ontario N5C 3V6
(519) 485-1700
Business Address: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3J4
(519) 245-1550

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Strathroy Middlesex General Hosp
Department of Emergency Medicine
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 245-1550
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Alexandra Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
29 Noxon St
Ingersoll Ontario N5C 3V6
Phone: 519-485-1700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Four Counties Health Services
Department of Emergency Medicine
1824 Concession Dr
Newbury Ontario N0L 1Z0
Phone: 519-693-4441
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David L. Lam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lam (CPSO#: 84536 )
Business Address: 1824 Concession Drive
Newbury Ontario N0L 1Z0
(519) 693-4441
Business Address: 29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll Ontario N5C 3V6
(519) 485-1700
Business Address: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3J4
(519) 245-1550

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID LIEUDE LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID LIEUDE LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 19 Apr 2021
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 19 Apr 2021
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 01 Dec 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 May 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jan 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 May 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 25 May 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 May 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 May 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006