THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:34:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 36 Heritage Drive
Ilderton Ontario N0M 2A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 666-1610
Fax: (519) 666-0281
Address: 1340 Huron Street
London Ontario N5V 3R3
Phone: (519) 455-3910
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Leger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Leger (CPSO#: 84539 )
Business Address: Kensington Village
1340 Huron Street
London Ontario N5V 3R3
(519) 455-3910
Business Address: 36 Heritage Drive
Ilderton Ontario N0M 2A0
(519) 666-1610

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 36 Heritage Drive
Ilderton Ontario N0M 2A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 666-1610
Fax: (519) 666-0281
Address: 1340 Huron Street
London Ontario N5V 3R3
Phone: (519) 455-3910
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Leger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Leger (CPSO#: 84539 )
Business Address: Kensington Village
1340 Huron Street
London Ontario N5V 3R3
(519) 455-3910
Business Address: 36 Heritage Drive
Ilderton Ontario N0M 2A0
(519) 666-1610

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL LEGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL LEGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEGER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006