THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:43:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 208
4100 Strandherd Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2J0V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-505-9704
Fax: 613-505-9707

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matin & Malakieh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Matin (CPSO#: 84393 ) Dr. N. Malakieh (CPSO#: 84541 )
Business Address: 3500 Fallowfield Road
Unit 1C
Ottawa Ontario K2J 4A7
(613) 843-1718
Business Address: 4100 Strandherd Drive
Suite 208
Nepean Ontario K2J 0V2
(613) 505-9704

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 208
4100 Strandherd Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2J0V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-505-9704
Fax: 613-505-9707

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matin & Malakieh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Matin (CPSO#: 84393 ) Dr. N. Malakieh (CPSO#: 84541 )
Business Address: 3500 Fallowfield Road
Unit 1C
Ottawa Ontario K2J 4A7
(613) 843-1718
Business Address: 4100 Strandherd Drive
Suite 208
Nepean Ontario K2J 0V2
(613) 505-9704

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADIA MALAKIEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALAKIEH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADIA MALAKIEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALAKIEH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Jan 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006