THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:56:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campus
Division of Rheumatology
1967 Riverside Drive Box 37
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Extension: 81871
Fax: (613) 738-8488

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Milman (CPSO#: 84542 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
Department of Rheumatology
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 738-8400 Extn: 81871

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campus
Division of Rheumatology
1967 Riverside Drive Box 37
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Extension: 81871
Fax: (613) 738-8488

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Milman (CPSO#: 84542 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
Department of Rheumatology
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 738-8400 Extn: 81871

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIYA MILMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIYA MILMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 May 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006