THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:07:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cambridge Health Link
Unit B10
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 740-5010
Fax: (519) 740-6010

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Kumanan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kumanan (CPSO#: 84565 )
Business Address: Cambridge Health Link
Unit B10
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7L7
(519) 740-5010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cambridge Health Link
Unit B10
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 740-5010
Fax: (519) 740-6010

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Kumanan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kumanan (CPSO#: 84565 )
Business Address: Cambridge Health Link
Unit B10
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7L7
(519) 740-5010

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEKALAI KUMANAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMANAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEKALAI KUMANAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMANAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006