THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:14:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Childrens Hospital
Room 3G 103
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: 905)521-7978

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Min Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Min (CPSO#: 84567 )
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1H4
905212100 Extn: 76987

Corporation Name: S. Min Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Sep 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, KOREAN
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Childrens Hospital
Room 3G 103
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: 905)521-7978

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Min Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Min (CPSO#: 84567 )
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1H4
905212100 Extn: 76987

Corporation Name: S. Min Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Sep 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOH-YOON MIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOH-YOON MIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006