THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:59:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1077 North Service Rd., Unit 23, Suite 210
Mississauga ON L4Y 1A6
Phone: 905-273-9009
Fax: 905-273-6409

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vincent Tsui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Tsui (CPSO#: 84586 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1077 North Service Rd., Unit 23, Suite 210
Mississauga ON L4Y 1A6
Phone: 905-273-9009
Fax: 905-273-6409

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vincent Tsui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Tsui (CPSO#: 84586 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VINCENT TIEN-HUN TSUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSUI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VINCENT TIEN-HUN TSUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSUI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006