THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:37:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Health Center
Department of Family Medicine
50 College Dr, PO Box 2500
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Extension: 4500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Linda Rankin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Rankin (CPSO#: 84593 )
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Health Center
Department of Family Medicine
50 College Dr, PO Box 2500
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Extension: 4500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Linda Rankin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Rankin (CPSO#: 84593 )
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 474-8600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA RANKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANKIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDA RANKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANKIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006