THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 12:17:47 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medicine
The Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
Box 209
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 77137
Fax: (613) 737-8688
Address: Department of Critical Care
Queensway-Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Extension: 2651
Fax: (613) 491-0673

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.M. Iyengar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Iyengar (CPSO#: 84594 )
Business Address: Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 77137
Business Address: Queensway-Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000 Extn: 2651

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medicine
The Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
Box 209
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 77137
Fax: (613) 737-8688
Address: Department of Critical Care
Queensway-Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Extension: 2651
Fax: (613) 491-0673

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.M. Iyengar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Iyengar (CPSO#: 84594 )
Business Address: Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 77137
Business Address: Queensway-Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 721-2000 Extn: 2651

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AKSHAI MOHAN IYENGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IYENGAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AKSHAI MOHAN IYENGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IYENGAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006