THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:24:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall General Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Cornwall General Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lana Castellucci Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Castellucci (CPSO#: 84595 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: 840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
(613) 938-4240

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall General Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Cornwall General Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lana Castellucci Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Castellucci (CPSO#: 84595 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: 840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
(613) 938-4240

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LANA ANTOINETTE CASTELLUCCI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASTELLUCCI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LANA ANTOINETTE CASTELLUCCI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASTELLUCCI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 May 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006