THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/05/25 02:42:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 801 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON M5N 1E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7155 Woodbine Avenue suite 106
Markham Ontario L3R 1A3
Phone: 4167892449
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2000 Credit Valley Rd
GSH Medical unit 405/406
Mississauga ON L5M 4N4
Phone: 1-866-611-7642
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 901 King Street West
suite 105
Toronto Ontario M5V 3H5
Phone: (416) 599-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2737 Keele Street
Toronto Ontario M3M 2E9
Phone: 18666117642
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shaun Segal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Segal (CPSO#: 84600 )
Business Address: Suite 105
901 King Street West
Toronto Ontario M5V 3H5
(416) 599-6000
Business Address: Suite 100/300
801 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1E3
(416) 189-2449
Business Address: 106 - 7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 1A3
(416) 789-2449

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 801 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON M5N 1E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7155 Woodbine Avenue suite 106
Markham Ontario L3R 1A3
Phone: 4167892449
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2000 Credit Valley Rd
GSH Medical unit 405/406
Mississauga ON L5M 4N4
Phone: 1-866-611-7642
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 901 King Street West
suite 105
Toronto Ontario M5V 3H5
Phone: (416) 599-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2737 Keele Street
Toronto Ontario M3M 2E9
Phone: 18666117642
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shaun Segal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Segal (CPSO#: 84600 )
Business Address: Suite 105
901 King Street West
Toronto Ontario M5V 3H5
(416) 599-6000
Business Address: Suite 100/300
801 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1E3
(416) 189-2449
Business Address: 106 - 7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 1A3
(416) 789-2449

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAUN MARK SEGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEGAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAUN MARK SEGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEGAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006