THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:09:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 15 Queens Quay E
Unit 102
Harbourfront Medical Clinic
Toronto ON M5E 0C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-366-2273
Fax: 416-366-5665

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Jul 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 02 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Raddatz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Raddatz (CPSO#: 84614 )
Business Address: Unit 4
8 York Street
Toronto Ontario M5J 2Y2
(416) 366-2273
Business Address: 15 Queens Quay East
Harbourfront Medical Clinic
Suite 102
Toronto Ontario M5E 0C5
4163662273

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 15 Queens Quay E
Unit 102
Harbourfront Medical Clinic
Toronto ON M5E 0C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-366-2273
Fax: 416-366-5665

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Jul 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 02 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Raddatz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Raddatz (CPSO#: 84614 )
Business Address: Unit 4
8 York Street
Toronto Ontario M5J 2Y2
(416) 366-2273
Business Address: 15 Queens Quay East
Harbourfront Medical Clinic
Suite 102
Toronto Ontario M5E 0C5
4163662273

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELAINE RADDATZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADDATZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELAINE RADDATZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADDATZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 06 Apr 2020
Summary of Decision:
On April 6, 2020, on the basis of agreed facts and admission, the Discipline Committee (the “Committee”) of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Raddatz committed an act of professional misconduct.

The Committee set out its penalty and costs order with written reasons to follow.

FACTS
 
Dr. Raddatz is 44 years old. She received her certificate of registration authorizing independent practice from the College in 2008, and currently practices family medicine in Toronto, Ontario.

Treatment of Self and Family Members; Writing Prescriptions for Self and Family Members in Colleague’s Name

In 2018, the College received a complaint that raised concerns that Dr. Raddatz had written prescriptions to herself and/or one or more of her family members using a colleague’s prescription pad.

Between April 2015 and July 2017, as set out below, Dr. Raddatz treated herself and members of her family by writing 28 prescriptions in her colleague’s name and using her colleague’s prescription pad. Dr. Raddatz’s colleague did not execute or authorize any of the 28 prescriptions written by Dr. Raddatz.

Dr. Raddatz signed her colleague’s name on 27 of the 28 prescriptions. The remaining prescription was not signed, though it was written by Dr. Raddatz on her colleague’s prescription pad.

Dr. Raddatz treated herself by writing 21 prescriptions to herself in her colleague’s name between April 2015 and July 2017 for sixty-six medications: antibiotics, aerosol inhalers, antihistamines, contraceptives, non-steroidal anti-inflammatories, an antiemetic, an oral vaccine, antivirals, a proton pump inhibitor, and topical prescription creams including antifungals, corticosteroids, and an immunomodulator. The prescriptions for antifungals were refills of existing prescriptions.

Dr. Raddatz treated Family Member A by writing 4 prescriptions to Family Member A in her colleague’s name between November 2015 and September 2016 for 18 medications: antibiotics, aerosol inhalers, antihistamines, a proton pump inhibitor, a selective serotonin and norepinephrine reuptake inhibitor, an anti-asthmatic, and topical prescription creams including antifungals and a corticosteroid.

Dr. Raddatz treated Family Member B by writing 2 prescriptions to Family Member B in her colleague’s name in April 2015 and February 2016 for 3 medications: antibiotics and a steroid cream.

Dr. Raddatz treated Family Member C by writing one prescription to Family Member C in her colleague’s name in October 2015, for Ritalin. The prescription for Ritalin was a refill of an existing prescription. Ritalin is a controlled substance. None of the other prescriptions at issue were for a controlled substance.

During the investigation, in response to a question from College investigators, Dr. Raddatz acknowledged that she had written the 28 prescriptions in her colleague’s name.

Dr. Raddatz did not maintain patient charts for the family members to whom she prescribed and who she treated.

Dr. Raddatz did not bill OHIP for prescribing to and treating herself and her family members.

Dr. Raddatz’s treatment of herself and her family members did not comply with the College’s Policy on Physician Treatment of Self, Family Members, or Others Close to Them.

ADMISSION

Dr. Raddatz does not contest the facts above, and does not contest that, based on these facts, she engaged in professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of O Reg.

856/93, in that she engaged in acts or omissions relevant to the practice of medicine that would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

FINDING

The Committee found that Dr. Raddatz engaged in professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of O Reg. 856/93, in that she engaged in acts or omissions relevant to the practice of medicine that would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

FACTS ON PENALTY

Dr. Raddatz’s misconduct took place during a period of significant personal stress and anxiety, and in the context of a difficult family dynamic.

Dr. Raddatz’s History with the College

In December 2017, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) considered an investigation into Dr. Raddatz’s practice undertaken pursuant to s.

75(1)(a) of the Health Professions Procedural Code. The ICRC was of the view that Dr. Raddatz could improve on deficiencies in her records management. It directed Dr. Raddatz to complete a Specified Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), consisting of:

(a) two CMPA e-learning modules on medical record-keeping;

(b) the University of Toronto Medical Record-Keeping Course;

(c) review and written summary of the College’s policies on Test Results Management and Medical Records, and the College’s Practice Guide;

(d) a six (6) month period of clinical supervision; and

(e) a reassessment of Dr. Raddatz’s practice.

Dr. Raddatz completed all elements of the SCERP, including a reassessment of her practice by Dr. Karen Ferguson in July 2019. Dr. Ferguson summarized her conclusions as follows:

The care provided to these patients by Dr. Raddatz meets the standard of practice of the profession in all 20 charts. Dr. Raddatz has made significant improvements in her record-keeping and her test results management. She has implemented several new processes to ensure that abnormal test results are followed up appropriately and managed in a timely fashion.

Dr. Raddatz’s care does not display a lack of knowledge, skill, or judgement in any of these 20 charts.

Dr. Raddatz’s clinical practice, behavior, or conduct is not likely to expose her patients to harm or injury in any of these 20 charts.

Dr. Raddatz has no prior Discipline history.

PENALTY AND COSTS

Dr. Raddatz is to attend before the panel to be reprimanded.

The Registrar is to suspend Dr. Raddatz’s certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months, commencing from the later of October 6, 2020 at 12:01 a.m.; or 15 days after such date on which all declarations of emergency with regard to the outbreak of the novel coronavirus COVID-19 have been officially lifted from each of the City of Toronto, the Province of Ontario, and if applicable, the country of Canada.

The Registrar is to place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Raddatz’s certificate of registration:
- Dr. Raddatz will participate in the PROBE Ethics & Boundaries Program offered by the Centre for Personalized Education for Professionals (“the PROBE program”) by receiving a passing evaluation or grade, without any condition or qualification. Dr. Raddatz will complete the PROBE program within six months of the date of this Order, and will provide proof to the College of her completion, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one month of completing it. In the event that Dr. Raddatz is unable to complete the PROBE course within six months, either because the course is not being offered or because her medical services are required due to the Covid-19 pandemic, then she will have an additional six (6) months in which to complete the PROBE course.

Dr. Raddatz is to pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within ninety (90) days from the date of the Order.

DECISION AND REASONS

On June 24, 2020, the Committee released its full Decision and Reasons in this matter, available for review on the College’s website.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): April 6, 2020 at 9:30 a.m.

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 13 Dec 2017
Summary:
Effective September 4, 2019, Dr.Raddatz has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 06 Apr 2020
Summary of Decision:
On April 6, 2020, on the basis of agreed facts and admission, the Discipline Committee (the “Committee”) of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Raddatz committed an act of professional misconduct.

The Committee set out its penalty and costs order with written reasons to follow.

FACTS
 
Dr. Raddatz is 44 years old. She received her certificate of registration authorizing independent practice from the College in 2008, and currently practices family medicine in Toronto, Ontario.

Treatment of Self and Family Members; Writing Prescriptions for Self and Family Members in Colleague’s Name

In 2018, the College received a complaint that raised concerns that Dr. Raddatz had written prescriptions to herself and/or one or more of her family members using a colleague’s prescription pad.

Between April 2015 and July 2017, as set out below, Dr. Raddatz treated herself and members of her family by writing 28 prescriptions in her colleague’s name and using her colleague’s prescription pad. Dr. Raddatz’s colleague did not execute or authorize any of the 28 prescriptions written by Dr. Raddatz.

Dr. Raddatz signed her colleague’s name on 27 of the 28 prescriptions. The remaining prescription was not signed, though it was written by Dr. Raddatz on her colleague’s prescription pad.

Dr. Raddatz treated herself by writing 21 prescriptions to herself in her colleague’s name between April 2015 and July 2017 for sixty-six medications: antibiotics, aerosol inhalers, antihistamines, contraceptives, non-steroidal anti-inflammatories, an antiemetic, an oral vaccine, antivirals, a proton pump inhibitor, and topical prescription creams including antifungals, corticosteroids, and an immunomodulator. The prescriptions for antifungals were refills of existing prescriptions.

Dr. Raddatz treated Family Member A by writing 4 prescriptions to Family Member A in her colleague’s name between November 2015 and September 2016 for 18 medications: antibiotics, aerosol inhalers, antihistamines, a proton pump inhibitor, a selective serotonin and norepinephrine reuptake inhibitor, an anti-asthmatic, and topical prescription creams including antifungals and a corticosteroid.

Dr. Raddatz treated Family Member B by writing 2 prescriptions to Family Member B in her colleague’s name in April 2015 and February 2016 for 3 medications: antibiotics and a steroid cream.

Dr. Raddatz treated Family Member C by writing one prescription to Family Member C in her colleague’s name in October 2015, for Ritalin. The prescription for Ritalin was a refill of an existing prescription. Ritalin is a controlled substance. None of the other prescriptions at issue were for a controlled substance.

During the investigation, in response to a question from College investigators, Dr. Raddatz acknowledged that she had written the 28 prescriptions in her colleague’s name.

Dr. Raddatz did not maintain patient charts for the family members to whom she prescribed and who she treated.

Dr. Raddatz did not bill OHIP for prescribing to and treating herself and her family members.

Dr. Raddatz’s treatment of herself and her family members did not comply with the College’s Policy on Physician Treatment of Self, Family Members, or Others Close to Them.

ADMISSION

Dr. Raddatz does not contest the facts above, and does not contest that, based on these facts, she engaged in professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of O Reg.

856/93, in that she engaged in acts or omissions relevant to the practice of medicine that would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

FINDING

The Committee found that Dr. Raddatz engaged in professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of O Reg. 856/93, in that she engaged in acts or omissions relevant to the practice of medicine that would be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

FACTS ON PENALTY

Dr. Raddatz’s misconduct took place during a period of significant personal stress and anxiety, and in the context of a difficult family dynamic.

Dr. Raddatz’s History with the College

In December 2017, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) considered an investigation into Dr. Raddatz’s practice undertaken pursuant to s.

75(1)(a) of the Health Professions Procedural Code. The ICRC was of the view that Dr. Raddatz could improve on deficiencies in her records management. It directed Dr. Raddatz to complete a Specified Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), consisting of:

(a) two CMPA e-learning modules on medical record-keeping;

(b) the University of Toronto Medical Record-Keeping Course;

(c) review and written summary of the College’s policies on Test Results Management and Medical Records, and the College’s Practice Guide;

(d) a six (6) month period of clinical supervision; and

(e) a reassessment of Dr. Raddatz’s practice.

Dr. Raddatz completed all elements of the SCERP, including a reassessment of her practice by Dr. Karen Ferguson in July 2019. Dr. Ferguson summarized her conclusions as follows:

The care provided to these patients by Dr. Raddatz meets the standard of practice of the profession in all 20 charts. Dr. Raddatz has made significant improvements in her record-keeping and her test results management. She has implemented several new processes to ensure that abnormal test results are followed up appropriately and managed in a timely fashion.

Dr. Raddatz’s care does not display a lack of knowledge, skill, or judgement in any of these 20 charts.

Dr. Raddatz’s clinical practice, behavior, or conduct is not likely to expose her patients to harm or injury in any of these 20 charts.

Dr. Raddatz has no prior Discipline history.

PENALTY AND COSTS

Dr. Raddatz is to attend before the panel to be reprimanded.

The Registrar is to suspend Dr. Raddatz’s certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months, commencing from the later of October 6, 2020 at 12:01 a.m.; or 15 days after such date on which all declarations of emergency with regard to the outbreak of the novel coronavirus COVID-19 have been officially lifted from each of the City of Toronto, the Province of Ontario, and if applicable, the country of Canada.

The Registrar is to place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Raddatz’s certificate of registration:
- Dr. Raddatz will participate in the PROBE Ethics & Boundaries Program offered by the Centre for Personalized Education for Professionals (“the PROBE program”) by receiving a passing evaluation or grade, without any condition or qualification. Dr. Raddatz will complete the PROBE program within six months of the date of this Order, and will provide proof to the College of her completion, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one month of completing it. In the event that Dr. Raddatz is unable to complete the PROBE course within six months, either because the course is not being offered or because her medical services are required due to the Covid-19 pandemic, then she will have an additional six (6) months in which to complete the PROBE course.

Dr. Raddatz is to pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within ninety (90) days from the date of the Order.

DECISION AND REASONS

On June 24, 2020, the Committee released its full Decision and Reasons in this matter, available for review on the College’s website.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): April 6, 2020 at 9:30 a.m.

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 13 Dec 2017
Summary:
Effective September 4, 2019, Dr.Raddatz has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2021
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 06 Apr 2021
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Oct 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006