THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:17:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-790 Bay St
Taddle Creek Family Health Team
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-960-1366
Fax: 416-960-1945
Address: 4th Floor
60 Murray Street
PO Box 25
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 3190
Fax: 416-586-3175

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shari Chung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chung (CPSO#: 84616 )
Business Address: 300-790 Bay St
Taddle Creek Family Health Team
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
416-960-1366
Business Address: 203 - 565 College Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 1B2
(416) 538-6653
Business Address: 60 Murray Street
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 3190

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-790 Bay St
Taddle Creek Family Health Team
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-960-1366
Fax: 416-960-1945
Address: 4th Floor
60 Murray Street
PO Box 25
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 3190
Fax: 416-586-3175

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shari Chung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chung (CPSO#: 84616 )
Business Address: 300-790 Bay St
Taddle Creek Family Health Team
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
416-960-1366
Business Address: 203 - 565 College Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 1B2
(416) 538-6653
Business Address: 60 Murray Street
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 3190

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARI ASHIKA CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARI ASHIKA CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006