THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:20:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jawaharlal Inst Postgraduate Med Educ, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ivey Eye Institute
St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8795
Fax: (519) 646-6094
Address: London Health Sciences Centre
750 Commissioners Street
London Ontario N6A 4G5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 10 Sep 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dave and Sharan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dave (CPSO#: 83320 ) Dr. S. Sharan (CPSO#: 84623 )
Business Address: Ivey Eye Institute
St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
Room B1-531
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 685-8795
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
750 Commissioners Street
London Ontario N6A 4G5
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus - Department of Surgery
E2-650 - 800 Commissioners Road East
PO Box 5010
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8439

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Jawaharlal Inst Postgraduate Med Educ, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ivey Eye Institute
St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8795
Fax: (519) 646-6094
Address: London Health Sciences Centre
750 Commissioners Street
London Ontario N6A 4G5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 10 Sep 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dave and Sharan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dave (CPSO#: 83320 ) Dr. S. Sharan (CPSO#: 84623 )
Business Address: Ivey Eye Institute
St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
Room B1-531
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 685-8795
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
750 Commissioners Street
London Ontario N6A 4G5
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus - Department of Surgery
E2-650 - 800 Commissioners Road East
PO Box 5010
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8439

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 Aug 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 10 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SAPNA SHARAN may practise medicine independently in ophthalmology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SAPNA SHARAN may practise medicine independently in ophthalmology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jawaharlal Inst Postgraduate Med Educ, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Aug 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006