THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:05:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trenton Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
242 King Street East
Trenton Ontario K8V 5S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Extension: 5466
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allan Curtis Bell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Sep 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bell (CPSO#: 84628 )
Business Address: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Site
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-3232
Business Address: Queen's University
Family Medicine
220 Bagot Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5E9
(613) 533-9300
Business Address: QHC Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton Ontario K8V 5S6
(613) 392-2540
Business Address: QHC Belleville General Hospital
Emergency Department
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 969-7400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trenton Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
242 King Street East
Trenton Ontario K8V 5S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Extension: 5466
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allan Curtis Bell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Sep 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bell (CPSO#: 84628 )
Business Address: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Site
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-3232
Business Address: Queen's University
Family Medicine
220 Bagot Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5E9
(613) 533-9300
Business Address: QHC Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton Ontario K8V 5S6
(613) 392-2540
Business Address: QHC Belleville General Hospital
Emergency Department
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 969-7400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLAN CURTIS BELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLAN CURTIS BELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006