THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:44:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: Buchanan, Susan Katherine (Used Until: 27 Aug 2006)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Centenary Hospital
Medicine
9th Floor
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thouin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Thouin (CPSO#: 84635 )
Business Address: 1 Kenton Drive
North York Ontario M2R 2H6
(647) 932-7913
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 438-2911
Business Address: Temmy Latner Centre
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-4800
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 438-2911

General Information

Former Name: Buchanan, Susan Katherine (Used Until: 27 Aug 2006)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Centenary Hospital
Medicine
9th Floor
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thouin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Thouin (CPSO#: 84635 )
Business Address: 1 Kenton Drive
North York Ontario M2R 2H6
(647) 932-7913
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 438-2911
Business Address: Temmy Latner Centre
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-4800
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 438-2911

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN KATHERINE THOUIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOUIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN KATHERINE THOUIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOUIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006