THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:15:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 105
385 Silver Star Boulevard
Scarborough Ontario M1V 0E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 496-2228
Fax: (416) 496-2229
Address: Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Hospital
7th Floor
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7013
Fax: (416) 281-7102

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 12 Dec 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Dec 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joyce C.Y. Ching Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ching (CPSO#: 84643 )
Business Address: Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
7th West
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 281-7013
Business Address: Suite 105
385 Silver Star Boulevard
Scarborough Ontario M1V 0E3
(416) 496-2228

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 105
385 Silver Star Boulevard
Scarborough Ontario M1V 0E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 496-2228
Fax: (416) 496-2229
Address: Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Hospital
7th Floor
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7013
Fax: (416) 281-7102

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 12 Dec 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Dec 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joyce C.Y. Ching Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ching (CPSO#: 84643 )
Business Address: Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
7th West
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 281-7013
Business Address: Suite 105
385 Silver Star Boulevard
Scarborough Ontario M1V 0E3
(416) 496-2228

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOYCE CHEUNG YEE CHING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOYCE CHEUNG YEE CHING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006