THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 02:38:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 18-3545 Odyssey Dr
Mississauga ON L5M 2S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-828-6777
Fax: 905-828-6770

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adriano J Correia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Correia (CPSO#: 84646 )
Business Address: Unit 509
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
(905) 828-6777
Business Address: 183 - 2225 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L5K 1T9
(905) 823-0223
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: 3545 Odyssey Drive
unit 18
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2S4
905-828-6777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 18-3545 Odyssey Dr
Mississauga ON L5M 2S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-828-6777
Fax: 905-828-6770

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adriano J Correia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Correia (CPSO#: 84646 )
Business Address: Unit 509
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
(905) 828-6777
Business Address: 183 - 2225 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga Ontario L5K 1T9
(905) 823-0223
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200
Business Address: 3545 Odyssey Drive
unit 18
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2S4
905-828-6777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIANO JOSE CORREIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORREIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIANO JOSE CORREIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORREIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006