THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:35:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: iHealth Centre
Units 19/20
6175 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 850-3091
Fax: (416) 840-8434
Address: Dixie Urgent Care Centre
1500 Dundas St E
Mississauga Ontario L4X 1L4
Phone: 905-212-1433
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christina Dakhil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dakhil (CPSO#: 84647 )
Business Address: Units 21 & 22
6175 Highway 7
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 0P6
(905) 850-3091

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: iHealth Centre
Units 19/20
6175 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 850-3091
Fax: (416) 840-8434
Address: Dixie Urgent Care Centre
1500 Dundas St E
Mississauga Ontario L4X 1L4
Phone: 905-212-1433
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christina Dakhil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dakhil (CPSO#: 84647 )
Business Address: Units 21 & 22
6175 Highway 7
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 0P6
(905) 850-3091

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINA MARIE DAKHIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAKHIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINA MARIE DAKHIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAKHIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006