THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 16:32:38 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke General Hospital , WOHS
Department of Anesthesia
101 Humber College Blvd.
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Extension: 33554
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 04 Nov 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Eve and Ben-Ari Fried Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Fried (CPSO#: 84655 ) Dr. E. Fried (CPSO#: 79058 )
Business Address: Suite 207
8077 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 7X7
(905) 850-0004
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital-WOHS
Department of Anesthesia
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke General Hospital , WOHS
Department of Anesthesia
101 Humber College Blvd.
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Extension: 33554
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 04 Nov 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Eve and Ben-Ari Fried Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Fried (CPSO#: 84655 ) Dr. E. Fried (CPSO#: 79058 )
Business Address: Suite 207
8077 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 7X7
(905) 850-0004
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital-WOHS
Department of Anesthesia
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEN-ARI FRIED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRIED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEN-ARI FRIED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRIED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006