THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:56:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke General Hospital
Department Of Emergency Medicine
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department Of Emergency Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Peel Memorial Urgent Care Centre
20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: 9054944120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jaclyn Herman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Herman (CPSO#: 84662 )
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
Deparment of Emergency Medicine
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3400
Business Address: Peel Memorial Urgent Care Centre
20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Department of Emergency Medicine
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
(905)576-8711

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke General Hospital
Department Of Emergency Medicine
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department Of Emergency Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Peel Memorial Urgent Care Centre
20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: 9054944120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jaclyn Herman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Herman (CPSO#: 84662 )
Business Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
Deparment of Emergency Medicine
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 747-3400
Business Address: Peel Memorial Urgent Care Centre
20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Department of Emergency Medicine
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
(905)576-8711

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACLYN JESSICA HERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACLYN JESSICA HERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006