THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:59:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Solstice Way
Waterloo ON N2K 0G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-578-9757
Fax: 519-578-9750

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Keleher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Keleher (CPSO#: 84670 )
Business Address: 100 Solstice Way
Waterloo ON N2K 0G3
519-578-9757

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Solstice Way
Waterloo ON N2K 0G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-578-9757
Fax: 519-578-9750

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Keleher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Keleher (CPSO#: 84670 )
Business Address: 100 Solstice Way
Waterloo ON N2K 0G3
519-578-9757

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN THOMAS KELEHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELEHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN THOMAS KELEHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELEHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006