THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:27:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Junction Road
Toronto Ontario M6R 2K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 766-1162
Fax: (416) 766-0463
Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Oct 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Mitoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mitoff (CPSO#: 84686 )
Business Address: 5 Junction Road
Toronto Ontario M6N 1B5
(416) 766-1162
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6000
Business Address: 96 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6R 2K8
(647) 748-4897

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Junction Road
Toronto Ontario M6R 2K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 766-1162
Fax: (416) 766-0463
Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 10 Oct 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Mitoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mitoff (CPSO#: 84686 )
Business Address: 5 Junction Road
Toronto Ontario M6N 1B5
(416) 766-1162
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6000
Business Address: 96 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6R 2K8
(647) 748-4897

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER MITOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITOFF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER MITOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITOFF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Dec 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006