THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:11:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Avenue
OPG 6-421
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2249
Fax: (416) 946-4407
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
12th Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 946-2249
Fax: (416) 946-6546

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 21 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anca Prica Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Prica (CPSO#: 84695 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
12th Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 946-2249
Business Address: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
OPG 6-421 - 610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2249

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Avenue
OPG 6-421
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2249
Fax: (416) 946-4407
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
12th Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 946-2249
Fax: (416) 946-6546

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 21 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anca Prica Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Prica (CPSO#: 84695 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
12th Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 946-2249
Business Address: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
OPG 6-421 - 610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2249

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANCA ALEXANDRA PRICA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRICA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANCA ALEXANDRA PRICA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRICA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006