THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:47:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 Saint Thomas St
Unit 100
Toronto ON M5S 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-971-7601
Fax: 437-317-9601

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Evelyn Rubin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Rubin (CPSO#: 84697 )
Business Address: 2 Saint Thomas St
Unit 100
Toronto ON M5S 2Z1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 Saint Thomas St
Unit 100
Toronto ON M5S 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-971-7601
Fax: 437-317-9601

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Evelyn Rubin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Rubin (CPSO#: 84697 )
Business Address: 2 Saint Thomas St
Unit 100
Toronto ON M5S 2Z1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVELYN TOBIE RUBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVELYN TOBIE RUBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006