THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 09:02:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 300
440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 603 5888
Extension: 1
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frost Toubassi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Frost (CPSO#: 84656 ) Dr. D. Toubassi (CPSO#: 84716 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
339 Bathurst Street
8E-428
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5888
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Room 8E 424
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800 Extn: 2936

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 300
440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 603 5888
Extension: 1
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frost Toubassi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Frost (CPSO#: 84656 ) Dr. D. Toubassi (CPSO#: 84716 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
339 Bathurst Street
8E-428
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5888
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Room 8E 424
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800 Extn: 2936

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANA TOUBASSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOUBASSI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANA TOUBASSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOUBASSI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006