THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:40:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 508
2300 Eglinton Ave West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 608-2424
Fax: (905) 608-2992

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 04 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.M. Wolski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Wolski (CPSO#: 84726 )
Business Address: Suite 508
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
(905) 608-2424

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 508
2300 Eglinton Ave West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 608-2424
Fax: (905) 608-2992

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 04 Oct 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.M. Wolski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Wolski (CPSO#: 84726 )
Business Address: Suite 508
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
(905) 608-2424

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WINICJUSZ MAREK WOLSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WINICJUSZ MAREK WOLSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006