THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:29:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lyndhurst Centre
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto Ontario M4G 3V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Extension: 6000
Fax: (416) 467-5665
Address: Lakeside LTC
150 Dunn Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6K2R7
Phone: 416-533-2828
Extension: 400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care Toronto
University Health Network Lyndhurst Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Lyndhurst Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Zimcik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Zimcik (CPSO#: 84730 )
Business Address: 150 Dunn Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6K 2R6
(416) 533-2828
Business Address: Lyndhurst Centre
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto Ontario M4G 3V9
(416) 597-3422 Extn: 6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lyndhurst Centre
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto Ontario M4G 3V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Extension: 6000
Fax: (416) 467-5665
Address: Lakeside LTC
150 Dunn Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6K2R7
Phone: 416-533-2828
Extension: 400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care Toronto
University Health Network Lyndhurst Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Lyndhurst Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Zimcik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Zimcik (CPSO#: 84730 )
Business Address: 150 Dunn Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6K 2R6
(416) 533-2828
Business Address: Lyndhurst Centre
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto Ontario M4G 3V9
(416) 597-3422 Extn: 6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER LYNNE ZIMCIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIMCIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER LYNNE ZIMCIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIMCIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006