THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:31:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1979 16th Street East
Unit E3
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 5N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-371-1212
Fax: 1-833-297-8964

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geoffrey R. Wignall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wignall (CPSO#: 84754 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1979 16th Street East
Unit E3
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 5N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-371-1212
Fax: 1-833-297-8964

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geoffrey R. Wignall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wignall (CPSO#: 84754 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEOFFREY ROBERT WIGNALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIGNALL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEOFFREY ROBERT WIGNALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIGNALL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006