THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:18:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: James Snow Medical & Walk In Clinic
Unit C2
51 James Snow Parkway North
Milton Ontario L9E 0H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 636-1050
Fax: (905) 636-1090

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adriana Hajas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hajas (CPSO#: 84765 )
Business Address: James Snow Medical & Walk In Clinic
Unit-C3
51 James Snow Parkway North
Milton Ontario L9T 0R3
(905) 636-1050

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: James Snow Medical & Walk In Clinic
Unit C2
51 James Snow Parkway North
Milton Ontario L9E 0H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 636-1050
Fax: (905) 636-1090

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adriana Hajas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hajas (CPSO#: 84765 )
Business Address: James Snow Medical & Walk In Clinic
Unit-C3
51 James Snow Parkway North
Milton Ontario L9T 0R3
(905) 636-1050

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIANA PRODAN HAJAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAJAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIANA PRODAN HAJAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAJAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006