THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:07:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough, Ontario
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: MArkham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
MArkham, Ontario
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7373
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ilana Greenwald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Greenwald (CPSO#: 84768 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Emergency
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7111
Business Address: Scarborough General Hospital
Emergency
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 495-2701

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough, Ontario
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: MArkham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
MArkham, Ontario
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7373
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ilana Greenwald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Greenwald (CPSO#: 84768 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
Emergency
381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
(905) 472-7111
Business Address: Scarborough General Hospital
Emergency
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 495-2701

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ILANA RACHEL GREENWALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENWALD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ILANA RACHEL GREENWALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENWALD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006