THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:10:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3410 Sheppard Avenue East, Suite 208
Toronto ON M1T 3K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-245-3070
Fax: 647-670-0770

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chugh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Chugh (CPSO#: 84794 )
Business Address: 7335 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L3T 2B2
(905) 707-7309
Business Address: 14872 Yonge Street
Aurora Ontario L4G 1N2
(905) 505-0950
Business Address: 25 William Graham Drive
Aurora Ontario L4G 3G3
(905) 505-0950
Business Address: 14845 Yonge Street
Suite 301
Aurora Ontario L4G 1N1
(905) 505-0950
Business Address: 208-3410 Sheppard Ave E
Scarborough ON M1T 3K4
6472453070

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3410 Sheppard Avenue East, Suite 208
Toronto ON M1T 3K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-245-3070
Fax: 647-670-0770

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chugh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Chugh (CPSO#: 84794 )
Business Address: 7335 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L3T 2B2
(905) 707-7309
Business Address: 14872 Yonge Street
Aurora Ontario L4G 1N2
(905) 505-0950
Business Address: 25 William Graham Drive
Aurora Ontario L4G 3G3
(905) 505-0950
Business Address: 14845 Yonge Street
Suite 301
Aurora Ontario L4G 1N1
(905) 505-0950
Business Address: 208-3410 Sheppard Ave E
Scarborough ON M1T 3K4
6472453070

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAHER CHUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAHER CHUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006