THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:22:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Court
Lakeridge Health
Infectious Diseases Clinic
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-576-8711
Extension: x38002
Fax: 905-721-4877
Address: 300 Gordon Street
Positive Care Clinic
Whitby Ontario L1N 5T4
Phone: 905-668-6831
Extension: 3127
Fax: 905-665-2409

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health Whitby Site Whitby
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Whitby Site
LOCATION: Whitby

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site
LOCATION: Port Perry

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel R. Ricciuto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ricciuto (CPSO#: 84798 )
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Corporation
Room A6 23
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Court
Lakeridge Health
Infectious Diseases Clinic
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-576-8711
Extension: x38002
Fax: 905-721-4877
Address: 300 Gordon Street
Positive Care Clinic
Whitby Ontario L1N 5T4
Phone: 905-668-6831
Extension: 3127
Fax: 905-665-2409

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health Whitby Site Whitby
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Whitby Site
LOCATION: Whitby

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site
LOCATION: Port Perry

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel R. Ricciuto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ricciuto (CPSO#: 84798 )
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Corporation
Room A6 23
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL ROBERT RICCIUTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICCIUTO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL ROBERT RICCIUTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICCIUTO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006