THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:11:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 252 DUNDAS St. East
Waterdown Ontario L8B 0E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 689 8886
Fax: (905) 6898830

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dalia Rizk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rizk (CPSO#: 84815 )
Business Address: 2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
(905) 336-3437
Business Address: 252 Dundas Street East
Waterdown Ontario L8B0E7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 252 DUNDAS St. East
Waterdown Ontario L8B 0E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 689 8886
Fax: (905) 6898830

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dalia Rizk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rizk (CPSO#: 84815 )
Business Address: 2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
(905) 336-3437
Business Address: 252 Dundas Street East
Waterdown Ontario L8B0E7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DALIA ANTOINE SAAD RIZK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIZK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DALIA ANTOINE SAAD RIZK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIZK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006