THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 04:06:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of Beirut, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa Ontario L1H 2J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 579-1212
Fax: 289-731-2048

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Aug 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 25 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Lebanon

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.A. Murtada Dite Al-Sayed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Murtada Dite Al-Sayed (CPSO#: 84818 )
Business Address: Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Area E
Oshawa Ontario L1H 2J9
(905) 579-1212

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: American University of Beirut, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa Ontario L1H 2J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 579-1212
Fax: 289-731-2048

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Aug 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 25 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Lebanon

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.A. Murtada Dite Al-Sayed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Murtada Dite Al-Sayed (CPSO#: 84818 )
Business Address: Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Area E
Oshawa Ontario L1H 2J9
(905) 579-1212

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUKAYNA ALY MURTADA DITE AL-SAYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURTADA DITE AL-SAYED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUKAYNA ALY MURTADA DITE AL-SAYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURTADA DITE AL-SAYED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of Beirut, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006