THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/04/25 22:12:27 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Nanjing Medical College, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 Tecumseh Rd W
Windsor ON N9B 3T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-253-2888
Fax: 519-253-0444

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Aug 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 25 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Jing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jing (CPSO#: 84821 )
Business Address: 2780 Totten Street
Windsor Ontario N9B 0A9
(519) 253-2888
Business Address: 1800 Tecumseh Rd W
Windsor ON N9B 3T2
5192532888
Business Address: 1800 Tecumseh Road West
Windsor Ontario N9B 3H2
5192532888

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: Nanjing Medical College, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 Tecumseh Rd W
Windsor ON N9B 3T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-253-2888
Fax: 519-253-0444

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Aug 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 25 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Jing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jing (CPSO#: 84821 )
Business Address: 2780 Totten Street
Windsor Ontario N9B 0A9
(519) 253-2888
Business Address: 1800 Tecumseh Rd W
Windsor ON N9B 3T2
5192532888
Business Address: 1800 Tecumseh Road West
Windsor Ontario N9B 3H2
5192532888

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIN JING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIN JING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Nanjing Medical College, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006