THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 00:47:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Humber College Boulevard
ETOBICOKE HOSPITAL
DEPARTMENT OF INTERNAL MEDICINE
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164942120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 55 Mountainash Road
Osler Hyperbarics & Wound Care
Unit 23
Brampton Ontario L6R 1W4
Phone: 3657471470
Fax: 9052160594
Address: William Osler Health System
Peel Memorial Centre
20 Lynch St
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1692 Lakeshore Road West
Under Pressure Hyperbaric Treatment Centre
Mississauga Ontario L5J 1J5
Phone: 9052742032
Fax: 9052744067
Address: 17730 Leslie Street
York Hyperbaric Medicine Centre
Suite 112
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 4W4
Phone: 2898039119
Fax: 9052351277
Address: 3075 Hospital Gate
Halton Hyperbarics
#100
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Phone: 4372918555
Fax: 2893513036
Address: IHealth Centre
6175 Hwy#7, Unit 19-22
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
Phone: (905) 850-3091
Fax: 4168408434

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victor Rajkotwala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Rajkotwala (CPSO#: 84844 )
Business Address: 100-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
4372918555
Business Address: William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 494-2120
Business Address: Suite 4
2 Kennedy Road South
Brampton Ontario L6W 3E1
(289) 323-0660
Business Address: Vaughan Diagnostic Medical Centre
Suites 19 and 22
6175 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
(416) 297-8362
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 150 West Dr
Brampton ON L6T 4P9
9054547410
Business Address: 1692 Lakeshore Rd W
Mississauga ON L5J 1J5
9052742032

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Humber College Boulevard
ETOBICOKE HOSPITAL
DEPARTMENT OF INTERNAL MEDICINE
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164942120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 55 Mountainash Road
Osler Hyperbarics & Wound Care
Unit 23
Brampton Ontario L6R 1W4
Phone: 3657471470
Fax: 9052160594
Address: William Osler Health System
Peel Memorial Centre
20 Lynch St
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1692 Lakeshore Road West
Under Pressure Hyperbaric Treatment Centre
Mississauga Ontario L5J 1J5
Phone: 9052742032
Fax: 9052744067
Address: 17730 Leslie Street
York Hyperbaric Medicine Centre
Suite 112
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 4W4
Phone: 2898039119
Fax: 9052351277
Address: 3075 Hospital Gate
Halton Hyperbarics
#100
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Phone: 4372918555
Fax: 2893513036
Address: IHealth Centre
6175 Hwy#7, Unit 19-22
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
Phone: (905) 850-3091
Fax: 4168408434

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victor Rajkotwala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Rajkotwala (CPSO#: 84844 )
Business Address: 100-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
4372918555
Business Address: William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(416) 494-2120
Business Address: Suite 4
2 Kennedy Road South
Brampton Ontario L6W 3E1
(289) 323-0660
Business Address: Vaughan Diagnostic Medical Centre
Suites 19 and 22
6175 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
(416) 297-8362
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 150 West Dr
Brampton ON L6T 4P9
9054547410
Business Address: 1692 Lakeshore Rd W
Mississauga ON L5J 1J5
9052742032

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTOR ABDULHUSEIN RAJKOTWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJKOTWALA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTOR ABDULHUSEIN RAJKOTWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJKOTWALA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Bombay, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Apr 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006