THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:07:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
P O Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Fax: (705) 435-5138
Address: GSH Medical Markham
7155 Woodbine Ave Suite 106
Markham Ontario L3R 1A3
Phone: 416-789-2449
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 19 Hospital Drive, Box 664
Moose Factory Ontario P0L 1W0
Phone: 705 658-4544
Fax: No Information Available
Address: GSH Medical
801 Eglinton Avenue West, Suite 100
Toronto Ontario M5N 1E3
Phone: 416-789-2449
Fax: 416-789-2253

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Lo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lo (CPSO#: 84868 )
Business Address: 7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 1A3
(416) 789-2449
Business Address: Box 664
19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory Ontario P0L 1W0
(705) 658-4544
Business Address: Unit 100
801 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M5N 1E3
(416) 789-2449
Business Address: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
(705) 435-6281
Business Address: Sp05-1028 McNicoll Ave
Scarborough ON M1W 0A8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
P O Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Fax: (705) 435-5138
Address: GSH Medical Markham
7155 Woodbine Ave Suite 106
Markham Ontario L3R 1A3
Phone: 416-789-2449
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 19 Hospital Drive, Box 664
Moose Factory Ontario P0L 1W0
Phone: 705 658-4544
Fax: No Information Available
Address: GSH Medical
801 Eglinton Avenue West, Suite 100
Toronto Ontario M5N 1E3
Phone: 416-789-2449
Fax: 416-789-2253

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Lo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lo (CPSO#: 84868 )
Business Address: 7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 1A3
(416) 789-2449
Business Address: Box 664
19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory Ontario P0L 1W0
(705) 658-4544
Business Address: Unit 100
801 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M5N 1E3
(416) 789-2449
Business Address: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston Ontario L9R 1W7
(705) 435-6281
Business Address: Sp05-1028 McNicoll Ave
Scarborough ON M1W 0A8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES WAI-BONG LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES WAI-BONG LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006