THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:31:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: UNIVERSITY OF PRISTINA, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ALBANIAN, BOSNIAN, CROATIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 100
34 Ottawa Street
PO Box 772
Morrisburg Ontario K0C 1X0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 543-2963
Fax: (613) 543-4171
Address: Winchester District Memorial Hosp
566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Fax: (613) 774-0453

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Salja Halili Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Salja Halili (CPSO#: 84881 )
Business Address: 5 College Street
Iroquois Ontario K0E 1K0
(613) 543-2963
Business Address: Suite 100
34 Ottawa Street
Morrisburg Ontario K0C 1X0
(613) 543-2963

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ALBANIAN, BOSNIAN, CROATIAN
Medical School: UNIVERSITY OF PRISTINA, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 100
34 Ottawa Street
PO Box 772
Morrisburg Ontario K0C 1X0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 543-2963
Fax: (613) 543-4171
Address: Winchester District Memorial Hosp
566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Fax: (613) 774-0453

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Salja Halili Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Salja Halili (CPSO#: 84881 )
Business Address: 5 College Street
Iroquois Ontario K0E 1K0
(613) 543-2963
Business Address: Suite 100
34 Ottawa Street
Morrisburg Ontario K0C 1X0
(613) 543-2963

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELVIRA SALJA HALILI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALJA HALILI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELVIRA SALJA HALILI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALJA HALILI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: UNIVERSITY OF PRISTINA, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006