THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:50:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 217-1099 Kingston Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-366-2343
Fax: 647-366-2344
Address: Toronto Memory Program
1 Valleybrook Drive, Suite 400
Toronto Ontario M3B 2S7
Phone: (416) 386-9761
Fax: (416) 386-0458
Address: 60 Richview Road
Ukrainian Canadian Care Centre
Toronto Ontario M9A 5E4
Phone: 416-243-7653
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Emmett Avenue
West Park Long-Term Care
Toronto Ontario M6M 2J5
Phone: 416-614-9494
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Sajed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sajed (CPSO#: 84882 )
Business Address: Toronto Memory Program
Suite 400
1 Valleybrook Drive
Toronto Ontario M3B 2S7
(416) 386-9761
Business Address: Courtice Health Care Centre
1450 Highway 2
Oshawa Ontario L1E 2C3
(905) 721-2760

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 217-1099 Kingston Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-366-2343
Fax: 647-366-2344
Address: Toronto Memory Program
1 Valleybrook Drive, Suite 400
Toronto Ontario M3B 2S7
Phone: (416) 386-9761
Fax: (416) 386-0458
Address: 60 Richview Road
Ukrainian Canadian Care Centre
Toronto Ontario M9A 5E4
Phone: 416-243-7653
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Emmett Avenue
West Park Long-Term Care
Toronto Ontario M6M 2J5
Phone: 416-614-9494
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Sajed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sajed (CPSO#: 84882 )
Business Address: Toronto Memory Program
Suite 400
1 Valleybrook Drive
Toronto Ontario M3B 2S7
(416) 386-9761
Business Address: Courtice Health Care Centre
1450 Highway 2
Oshawa Ontario L1E 2C3
(905) 721-2760

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SINA SAJED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAJED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SINA SAJED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAJED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006