THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:10:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad De La Sabana, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 104-175 Chancellors Way
Guelph ON N1G 0E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198217776
Fax: 5198237776
Address: 649 Scottsdale Drive
SR FHO AHC
unit 103
Guelph Ontario N1G 4T7
Phone: 5198217776
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Diaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Diaz (CPSO#: 84895 )
Business Address: 1-33 Farley Dr
Guelph ON N1L 0B7
519-897-8137
Business Address: 104-175 Chancellors Way
Guelph ON N1G 0E9

Corporation Name: Dr. Liliana Diaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Apr 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad De La Sabana, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 104-175 Chancellors Way
Guelph ON N1G 0E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198217776
Fax: 5198237776
Address: 649 Scottsdale Drive
SR FHO AHC
unit 103
Guelph Ontario N1G 4T7
Phone: 5198217776
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Diaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Diaz (CPSO#: 84895 )
Business Address: 1-33 Farley Dr
Guelph ON N1L 0B7
519-897-8137
Business Address: 104-175 Chancellors Way
Guelph ON N1G 0E9

Corporation Name: Dr. Liliana Diaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Apr 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LILIANA DIAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIAZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LILIANA DIAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIAZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad De La Sabana, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006