THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:39:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St.Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 631-2020
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y9
Phone: 5198423611
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.D. Harder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Harder (CPSO#: 84914 )
Business Address: St. Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
(519) 631-2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St.Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 631-2020
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y9
Phone: 5198423611
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.D. Harder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Harder (CPSO#: 84914 )
Business Address: St. Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
(519) 631-2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARROLL DIANN HARDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARDER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARROLL DIANN HARDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARDER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006