THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:08:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1750 Bank St
Ottawa ON K1V 7Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-792-4137
Fax: 613-792-1522
Address: 350 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
Phone: (613) 623-3166
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
Phone: (613) 257-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2675 Concession
Kemptville Ontario K0G 1J0
Phone: (613) 258-3435
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Spring Street
Mississippi Mills Ontario K0A 1A0
Phone: 6132562500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-1750 Bank St
Ottawa ON K1V 7Y6
Phone: 6137973264
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Perth & Smiths Falls District Hosp
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2H9
Phone: (613) 283-2330
Fax: (613) 283-8990
Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Melissa Forbes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Forbes (CPSO#: 84927 )
Business Address: 95 Spring Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
(613) 256-2500
Business Address: 330 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
(613) 623-3166
Business Address: 211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
Business Address: 75 Spring Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
(613) 256-9370
Business Address: 2675 Concession Road
Kemptville Ontario K0G 1J0
(613) 258-3435
Business Address: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
(613) 432-4851
Business Address: Winchester DM Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 774-2420
Business Address: 840 Berry Side Road
Dunrobin Ontario K0A 1T0
613-797-3264
Business Address: 840 Berry Side Road
Dunrobin Ontario K0A 1T0
6137973264

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1750 Bank St
Ottawa ON K1V 7Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-792-4137
Fax: 613-792-1522
Address: 350 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
Phone: (613) 623-3166
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
Phone: (613) 257-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2675 Concession
Kemptville Ontario K0G 1J0
Phone: (613) 258-3435
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Spring Street
Mississippi Mills Ontario K0A 1A0
Phone: 6132562500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-1750 Bank St
Ottawa ON K1V 7Y6
Phone: 6137973264
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Perth & Smiths Falls District Hosp
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2H9
Phone: (613) 283-2330
Fax: (613) 283-8990
Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Melissa Forbes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Forbes (CPSO#: 84927 )
Business Address: 95 Spring Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
(613) 256-2500
Business Address: 330 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
(613) 623-3166
Business Address: 211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
Business Address: 75 Spring Street
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
(613) 256-9370
Business Address: 2675 Concession Road
Kemptville Ontario K0G 1J0
(613) 258-3435
Business Address: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
(613) 432-4851
Business Address: Winchester DM Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 774-2420
Business Address: 840 Berry Side Road
Dunrobin Ontario K0A 1T0
613-797-3264
Business Address: 840 Berry Side Road
Dunrobin Ontario K0A 1T0
6137973264

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELEANOR MELISSA FORBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORBES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELEANOR MELISSA FORBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORBES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2006